IL SB1289 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
INS-DENTAL CARE/REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2023-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-05-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2023-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2023-05-16 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 075-040-000 |
2023-05-16 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |