IL SB1289 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Creates a uniform statement of economic interest form that must be completed by all persons who are required to file that form under the Act. Changes the nature of the required disclosures that must be made. Authorizes the Secretary of State to institute an electronic statement of economic interest filing system. Repeals a provision that established a separate form for persons required to file a statement of economic interests with county clerks. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ECONOMIC INTEREST STATEMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-03SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 010-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251706Amended CodeCitation Text
54201-102.5New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-104.3New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-104.4New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-104.5New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-105Amended CodeCitation Text
54201-105.2New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-105.3New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-105.4New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-105.6New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-105.7New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-110Amended CodeCitation Text
54201-112.5New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-113.6New CodeSee Bill Text
54201-113.7New CodeSee Bill Text
54204A-102Amended CodeCitation Text
54204A-103Amended CodeCitation Text
54204A-104Repealed CodeCitation Text
54204A-108Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback