IL SB1288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller may make sales and deliveries to importing distributors and distributors and may make sales and deliveries of up to 25,000 gallons of spirits to retail licensees per year. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1288&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1288.htm |