IL SB1287 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a duty of regional superintendents is to inspect the energy conservation measures of schools under the Code. In provisions concerning school energy conservation and savings measures, provides that qualified providers need to be licensed in accordance with the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989, the Professional Engineering Practice Act of 1989, or the Structural Engineering Practice Act of 1989. Provides for procedures for the submission of proposals. Provides for changes made under guaranteed energy savings contracts to be subject to performance reviews. Changes the period of time in which guaranteed energy savings contracts begin becoming cost effective from 20 years to 8 years. Changes references from "energy or operational costs" to "energy operating costs". Makes changes to various definitions. Makes other changes.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-004-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 19b-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-14.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |