IL SB1284 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act to create the Sales and Excise Tax Refund Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Department of Revenue to pay refunds under various tax Acts. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act to provide that 0.18% of 80% of the net revenue realized for the preceding month from the 6.25% general rate on the selling price of tangible personal property shall be deposited each month into the Sales and Excise Tax Refund Fund. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Machine Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, the Cigarette Use Tax Act, the Coin-Operated Amusement Device and Redemption Machine Tax Act, the Messages Tax Act, the Gas Revenue Tax Act, the Public Utilities Revenue Act, the Water Company Invested Capital Tax Act, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, and the Liquor Control Act of 1934 to provide that refunds shall be made under those Acts from the Sales and Excise Tax Refund Fund (instead of from appropriations made available for that purpose). Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SALES AND EXCISE TAX REFUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23558-3Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.875New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-101New CodeSee Bill Text
3510519Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
3511017Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
3511517Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text
351206Amended CodeCitation Text
351281-55Amended CodeCitation Text
351309dAmended CodeCitation Text
3513514aAmended CodeCitation Text
355102Amended CodeCitation Text
356106Amended CodeCitation Text
356156Amended CodeCitation Text
356206Amended CodeCitation Text
356256Amended CodeCitation Text
3563010Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback