IL SB1283 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Prepaid Wireless 9-1-1 Surcharge Act, the Public Utilities Act, and the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that certain tax returns filed under those Acts must be filed electronically. Provides that vendor discounts under those Acts are allowed only for returns that are filed electronically. Provides that the electronic return requirement does not apply to the Automobile Renting Occupation and Use Tax Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-ELECTRONIC FILING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220513-703Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text
351553Amended CodeCitation Text
351554Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.10Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.8Amended CodeCitation Text
5075320Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback