IL SB1282 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Removes provisions concerning third-party providers who ship wine on behalf of certain licensees, including reporting requirements, agency of a third-party provider, and rulemaking. Provides that grant funds from the Food and Drug Administration for conducting unannounced investigations of Illinois tobacco vendors are deposited into the Dram Shop Fund only until September 29, 2017. Removes an obsolete reporting requirement relating to compliance with the Federal ADAMHA Reorganization Act of 1992. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-THIRD PARTY PROVIDERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive
2018-04-04SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback