IL SB1280 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the State Tax Lien Registration Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall establish and maintain a public database known as the State Tax Lien Registry. Provides that, if any person neglects or refuses to pay any final tax liability, the Department of Revenue may file in the registry a notice of tax lien within 3 years from the date of the final tax liability. Provides that the tax lien is perfected upon inclusion in the registry and shall be attached to all of the existing and after-acquired property of the debtor. Provides that the Department of Revenue may impose filing fees and fees to release the lien. Provides that the Department of Revenue may sell at bulk the information appearing on the tax lien registry; however, that information may not be used by any party for survey, marketing, or solicitation purposes. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tax Act, and the Title Insurance Act to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOR-TAX LIEN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21515522Amended CodeCitation Text
351205aAmended CodeCitation Text
351205bAmended CodeCitation Text
351205cAmended CodeCitation Text
3551102Amended CodeCitation Text
3551103Amended CodeCitation Text
3551105Amended CodeCitation Text
3552016Amended CodeCitation Text
3552017Amended CodeCitation Text
3552019Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-3-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback