IL SB1273 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-12-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRe-referred to Agriculture
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback