IL SB1270 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that each park district, municipal park and recreation agency, or special recreation agency shall test each source of potable water in a park that serves children under 6 years old for lead contamination. Provides requirements for testing and notification. Provides requirements for requests seeking waiver of testing. Provides that the owner or operator of a community water system may agree to pay for the cost of the laboratory analysis of the test samples.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEAD IN DRINKING WATER-PARKS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22532035.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback