IL SB1266 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that a contractor may require either a performance bond or retention of payment of a subcontractor as part of the subcontract. Provides that a contractor may not require both.
Title
PROMPT PAY-SUBCONTRACTORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 540 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |