IL SB1265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Third Reading - Lost; 023-018-004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that minors under 18 years of age (rather than 15 years of age) at the time of the commission of an act committed by an adult would be a violation of first degree murder, intentional homicide of an unborn child, second degree murder, voluntary manslaughter of an unborn child, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide of an unborn child, drug-induced homicide, criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, criminal sexual abuse, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse, must be represented by counsel throughout the entire custodial interrogation of the minor. Provides that an oral, written, or sign language statement of a minor made without the presence of counsel during a custodial interrogation in violation of the Act on or after the effective date of the bill shall be inadmissible as evidence against the minor in a proceeding under the Act or under the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a conforming change in the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-COUNSEL & STATEMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Lost; 023-018-004
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Van Pelt
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-003-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-21SenateRe-assigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-170Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-401.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7255103-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback