IL SB1262 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a short title.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |