IL SB1261 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the commencement of an action for a declaration of invalidity of marriage.
Title
OWNERSHIP OF COMPANION ANIMAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0422 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-001-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Holmes |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |