IL SB1258 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that covered vehicle service provider personnel who treat and either release or transport to a health care facility an individual experiencing a suspected or an actual opioid overdose shall document in the patient's care report the date and time of the overdose, the location in latitude and longitude where the overdose victim was initially encountered, whether one or more doses of an opioid overdose reversal drug was administered, and whether the overdose was fatal or nonfatal when the overdose victim was initially encountered and during the transportation of the victim to a health care facility. Provides that a covered vehicle service provider shall also provide the information to a specified mapping application. Provides that the information documented by a covered vehicle service provider shall not be used in an opioid use-related criminal investigation or prosecution of the individual treated by the covered vehicle service provider personnel. Exempts from civil or criminal liability all covered vehicle service providers and covered vehicle service provider personnel who report the information in good faith. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
EMS SYSTEMS-OVERDOSE REPORTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0320 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |