IL SB1257 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes changes concerning the notice of tax sale and redemption rights and the notice of expiration of period of redemption to provide that certain information must appear in bold type. Provides that the notice of expiration of period of redemption shall also be served by conspicuously and securely posting the notice on or immediately adjacent to a principal entry door to the property. Provides that certain notices must also be sent by first class mail. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROPERTY TAX-NOTICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateSession Sine Die
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520022-10Amended CodeCitation Text
3520022-15Amended CodeCitation Text
3520022-20Amended CodeCitation Text
3520022-25Amended CodeCitation Text
3520022-45Amended CodeCitation Text
3520022-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback