IL SB1257 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, in a specified provision of the Act, "municipal waste" and "fuel derived from municipal waste" do not include non-hazardous secondary material that is excluded from solid waste when used legitimately as a fuel or ingredient in a combustion unit in accordance with the standards and criteria set forth in specified federal regulations. Provides that the determination of whether a material is a solid waste pursuant to the standards and criteria of federal regulations shall be obtained from the United States Environmental Protection Agency or from the Pollution Control Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-MUNICIPAL WASTE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2015-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2015-03-05SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2015-02-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2015-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415522.16bAmended CodeCitation Text
41559.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback