IL SB1254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Savings Bank Act. Provides that each savings bank and service corporation operating under the Act shall pay in quarterly installments equal to one-fourth of a specified rated regulatory fee determined by the amount of total assets (rather than previous rates and a fixed fee of $520). Makes related changes throughout the provisions. Provides that for any savings bank or service corporation operating under the Act that is examined by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation between January 1, 2017 and the effective date of the amendatory Act, a regulatory fee shall not be paid to or due to the Department for the first billing of the regulatory fee immediately following the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that an affected institution shall pay the regulatory fee as prescribed in the specified regulatory fee schedule beginning with the second billing of the regulatory fee by the Department following the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SAVINGS BANKS-REGULATORY FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0232 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 205 | 9002.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |