IL SB1252 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may issue a maximum of 5 commercial fishing licenses for taking from the Illinois waters of Lake Michigan yellow perch, bloater chub, and other commercial fish species designated by Department rule. Provides that, at times determined by the Director, the Department shall advertise a public drawing to accept new qualified commercial fishing candidates and establish a ranking order for these new candidates to fill open Lake Michigan commercial fishing licenses. Provides that the ranking order shall continue to be used until the list of eligible candidates is exhausted. Removes provisions concerning the issuing of commercial licenses.
Title
FISH-LAKE MICHIGAN COMMERC LIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 15-32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |