IL SB1249 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Penalty and Interest Act. Provides that the penalty for failure to pay the tax shown due or required to be shown due on a return shall be 15% (instead of 20%) of any amount that is paid after the date the Department of Revenue has initiated an audit or investigation of the taxpayer. Provides that the penalty shall be abated if the taxpayer paid to the Department at least 95% of the final liability resulting from an audit or investigation prior to the initiation of the audit or investigation. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UPIA-FAILURE TO FILE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
357353-3Amended CodeCitation Text
357353-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback