IL SB1249 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. In a provision concerning mental health system planning, provides that the Office of the Governor (instead of the Governor's Office of Health Innovation and Transformation) shall oversee a process for identifying needed services and identifying the financing strategies for developing those needed services. Makes a change in a provision concerning the purpose of the process. Adds language requiring the process to address the need and financing strategies for trauma-informed care. Requires the Office of the Governor (instead of the Governor's Office of Health Innovation and Transformation) to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly by January 15, 2016 (instead of July 1, 2015). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MENTAL HEALTH SYSTEM PLANNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-24 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-001-000 |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 49 | 1-101.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |