IL SB1248 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the county clerk shall abate 10% of the taxes imposed on qualified forest property that is part of a proposed new housing development. Provides that the owner of the property shall obtain approval from the Department of Natural Resources and shall submit a conservation plan and a new housing development plan to the Department of Natural Resources. Provides that "qualified forest property" means land of at least one acre that: (i) is at least 10% stocked by forest trees of any size; (ii) includes forest strips that are at least 120 feet wide; (iii) is managed in accordance with a conservation plan approved by the Department of Natural Resources; and (iv) is not developed for non-forest use as of January 1 of the first taxable year of the abatement. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-QUALIFIED FOREST ABATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1248&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1248.htm |