IL SB1248 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that no person may operate, use, or store (currently, operate) or give permission for the operation, usage, or storage (currently, operation) of any such watercraft on such waters unless it has on board while in operation a valid certificate of number issued under the Act, federal law, or another federally-approved numbering system of another state unless the pocket-sized certificate of number is in full force and effect or the operator is in possession of a valid 60 day temporary permit under the Act; and the identifying number set forth in the certificate of number is displayed on each side of the bow of such watercraft. Provides that watercraft requiring numbering applications shall be accompanied by a fee of up to $28 for a Class 1 watercraft and up to $60 for a Class 2 watercraft (rather than $18 for Class 1 watercraft and $50 for Class 2 watercraft). Provides that transfers of identification numbers with the Department of Natural Resources will bear a September 30 (rather than June 30) expiration date in the calendar year of expiration. Provides that new certificates of number issued will bear September 30 (rather than June 30) expiration dates in the calendar year 3 years after the issuing date. Provides that all certificates of number issued shall be renewed for 3 years from the nearest September 30 (rather than June 30). Provides that all certificates of number will be invalid after October 15 (rather than July 15) of the year of expiration. Limits the requirement for a certificate of title for watercraft required to be numbered to watercraft over 21 feet in length (rather than any watercraft). Repeals the Sections concerning water usage stamps and their required use on non-powered watercraft. Makes changes regarding the use of personal flotation devices. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BOAT REGISTRATION-FEES & USE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625453-1Amended CodeCitation Text
625453-1.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
625453-11Amended CodeCitation Text
625453-2Amended CodeCitation Text
625453-5Amended CodeCitation Text
625453-7.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
625453-9Amended CodeCitation Text
625453A-1Amended CodeCitation Text
625454-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback