IL SB1247 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Herptiles-Herps Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to regulate the protection, control, possession, and propagation of herptiles in this State. Reinserts the definition of "herpetoculture" and inserts the definitions "hybrid", "intergrade", "morphological variation", and "propagation" into the Act. Modifies other definitions. Replaces the term "reptile or amphibian life" with "herptile" throughout the Act. Modifies the possession limits of herptiles. Sets forth provisions relating to the propagation of herptiles and the issuance of a Herptile Endangered and Threatened Species Propagation permit. Modifies other provisions relating to permits. Makes changes to provisions regarding the taking of turtles or bullfrogs. Modifies provisions concerning alligator snapping turtles, crocodilians, monitor lizards, and certain toad species. Inserts a new Article relating to herptile diseases into the Act. Prohibits the possession of herptiles for commercial purposes unless otherwise authorized under the Act. Modifies liability provisions relating to the possession of a herptile. Changes provisions relating to violations, penalties, and enforcement of the Act. Inserts civil and criminal accountability provisions regarding a person who aids or contributes to a violation of the Act or administrative rule. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Endangered Species Act. Removes language in the Act referring to certain permitting provisions for endangered and threatened amphibians and reptiles in the Herptiles-Herps Act.
Title
HERPTILES-HERPS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0315 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |