IL SB1246 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board shall provide written notice of an alleged violation of provisions concerning the use of a video terminal by a minor to establishments licensed to conduct video gaming within 15 days after the alleged occurrence of the violation. Provides that the Board shall establish a policy and standards for compliance operations to investigate whether an establishment licensed to conduct video gaming is permitting any person under the age of 21 years to use or play a video gaming terminal in violation of the Act or furnishing alcoholic liquor to persons under 21 years of age in violation of the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Requires the Board to adopt emergency and permanent rules concerning the policy and standards for compliance operations. Provides that an establishment licensed to conduct video gaming that is the subject of an enforcement action under these provisions and is found, pursuant to the enforcement action, to be in compliance with the Act shall be notified by the Board that no violation was found within 30 days after the finding. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-NOTICE-VIOLATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0318 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-002 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |