IL SB1246 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Adds, to the list of personal property that is exempt from judgment, attachment, or distress for rent, moneys held in educational expense accounts and similar types of educational savings accounts, including, but not limited to, funds invested in an ABLE Account as defined by Section 529 of the Internal Revenue Code and funds invested in a 529 Plan as defined by Section 529 of the Internal Revenue Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUDGMENT-EXEMPT PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-14SenateRe-assigned to Judiciary
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735512-1001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback