IL SB1246 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0922
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0922
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Adds, to the list of personal property that is exempt from judgment, attachment, or distress for rent, moneys held in educational expense accounts and similar types of educational savings accounts, including, but not limited to, funds invested in an ABLE Account as defined by Section 529 of the Internal Revenue Code and funds invested in a 529 Plan as defined by Section 529 of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
JUDGMENT-EXEMPT PROPERTY
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0922 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 12-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |