IL SB1238 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires managed care organizations (MCOs) to publish, at least quarterly for the preceding quarter, on their websites: (1) the total number of claims received by the MCO; (2) the number and monetary amount of claims payments made to a service provider; (3) the dates of services rendered for the claims payments made under item (2); (4) the dates the claims were received by the MCO for the claims payments made under item (2); and (5) the dates on which claims payments under item (2) were released. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
MEDICAID-MCO PAYMENT INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1238&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1238.htm |