IL SB1236 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a co-payment scale that provides for cost sharing by families that receive child care services, including parents whose only income is from assistance under the Code (rather than the Department shall require co-payments for child care services by any parent, including parents whose only income is from assistance under the Code). Provides that the co-payment shall be based on family income and family size and may be based on other factors as appropriate (rather than based on family income, family size, and the number of children in care). Provides that co-payments may be waived for families whose incomes are at or below the federal poverty level (rather than co-payments shall not be increased due solely to a change in the methodology for counting family income). Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-CHILD CARE SRVCS-FEE SCALE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0422 |
2011-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2011 |
2011-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-05-02 | House | Re-assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-04-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-04-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |