IL SB1231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Designations Act. Provides that shelter dogs and shelter cats that are residing in or have been adopted from a shelter or rescue facility in this State are designated as the official State pet of the State of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE DESIGNATIONS-STATE PET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on State Designations |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1231&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1231.htm |