IL SB1230 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for child pornography as described in specified provisions involving a film, videotape, or other moving depiction or when the child depicted is under the age of 13, shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment.
Title
CD CORR-CHILD PORNOGRAPHY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1230&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1230.htm |