IL SB1228 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Illinois Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Illinois Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Practice Act. Makes changes in the definitions of "the practice of audiology" and "the practice of speech-language pathology" and in provisions concerning qualifications for licenses as a speech-language pathology assistant, supervision of speech-language pathology assistants, continuing education requirements, temporary licenses, and examination fees. Adds provisions concerning remote practice of audiology and speech-language pathology. Allows for the licensure of speech-language pathology applicants from foreign countries and makes other changes regarding applicants from other jurisdictions. Provides for reciprocity for persons licensed to practice audiology in another state or territory of the United States and licensing requirements for persons licensed to practice audiology in a foreign country. Restricts use of certain titles related to the practice. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SPEECH-LANGUAGE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 110 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 13.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 110 | 13.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 110 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 31a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 110 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 110 | 8.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1228&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1228.htm |