IL SB1226 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Repeals the State Charter School Commission Fund on October 1, 2020 (rather than July 31, 2020). Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2020 through August 31, 2020, all money in the State Charter School Commission Fund shall be used by the State Board of Education for operational and administrative costs and, on September 1, 2020 (rather than July 1, 2020), in consultation with the State Board, the State Comptroller shall order transferred and the State Treasurer shall transfer all money in the State Charter School Commission Fund to the State Board of Education Special Purpose Trust Fund. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2020, the State Board of Education may charge a charter school that it authorizes a fee not to exceed 3% of the revenue provided to the school to be used exclusively for covering the cost of authorizing activities; specifies what the authorizing activities may include. Provides that, beginning on the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Commission may not enter into or renew a contract, other than a charter renewal, that expires after July 1, 2020. Until July 1, 2020, allows the State Charter School Commission to hear an appeal on a local board's decision to not renew a charter. Allows the State Board of Education to reverse a local board's decision to revoke or, beginning on July 1, 2020, not renew a charter if certain conditions are met. Requires the State Board to appoint and utilize a hearing officer for those appeals. Provides that if a charter school fails to make payments toward administrative costs, the State Board may withhold State funds from that school until it has made all payments for those costs. Adds an immediate effective date.
Title
CHARTER SCH COMMISSION-ABOLISH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0543 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-009-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 010-000-001 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-029-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-011-001 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-002-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-002-000 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-10.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-11.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-7.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.796 | Amended Code | Citation Text |