IL SB1226 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Mandates Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2015-04-24SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2015-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2015-03-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
2015-03-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2015-03-26SenatePostponed - Executive
2015-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2015-03-19SenatePostponed - Executive
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2015-03-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-03-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2015-03-11SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-11SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308053Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback