IL SB1226 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings and declarations concerning sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy (SUDEP). Provides that the Department shall establish a SUDEP awareness program to educate medical examiners, examining physicians, and coroners in this State about SUDEP. Provides that all autopsies conducted in this State shall include an inquiry to determine whether the death was a direct result of a seizure or epilepsy. Provides that if a medical examiner's, examining physician's, or coroner's findings in an autopsy are consistent with the definition of known or suspected SUDEP, then the medical examiner, examining physician, or coroner shall take certain action.
Title
IDPH-SUDDEN DEATH-EPILEPSY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0340 |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2013 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Kotowski |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |