IL SB1226 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the State’s Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor for its FY 10 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$STATE’S ATTOR APPELLATE PROS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-12 Session Sine Die
2009-08-15 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2009-05-19 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2009
2009-05-19 Second Reading
2009-05-18 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2009
2009-05-18 Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-003-000
2009-05-12 Assigned to Appropriations I
2009-02-06 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-06 First Reading
2009-02-06 Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2009-02-06 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback