IL SB1223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Accelerated Placement Act. Provides that any student in a school district may be referred by a teacher, administrator, gifted education specialist, guidance counselor, school psychologist, or parent or legal guardian to the principal for evaluation for possible accelerated placement. Allows accelerated placement to include, but not be limited to, early entrance to kindergarten or first grade, accelerating a student in a single subject, compacting curriculum, concurrent enrollment, credit by examination, online learning courses, Advanced Placement courses, International Baccalaureate programs, grade acceleration, grade telescoping, and early high school graduation. Sets forth evaluation and appeal guidelines. Provides for the creation of an acceleration evaluation committee to evaluate a child for accelerated placement. Sets forth procedures for accelerated placement and evaluation of the placement. Requires school districts to report certain statistics to the State Board of Education, and for the State Board to create reports regarding accelerated placement. Provides that the State Board may adopt rules to implement the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACCELERATED PLACEMENT ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0421
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date July 1, 2018
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-001-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2017-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-011-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1223&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1223.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1223eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1223enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0421.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1223sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1223sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1223ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1223_05032017_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1223_05282017_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1223_05312017_033000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback