IL SB1222 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that if the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency operates a motor vehicle inspection station or contracts with one or more parties to operate an inspection station on its behalf, the Agency shall locate the station so that the owners of vehicles subject to inspection reside within 5 (rather than 12) miles of an official inspection station.
Title
VEH CD-VEH INSPECTION STATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 13C-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1222&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1222.htm |