IL SB1221 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from December 31, 2019 to December 31, 2029. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL PRACTICE ACT-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-15HouseArrived in House
2019-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jones
2019-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.29Repealed CodeCitation Text
5804.39Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback