IL SB1220 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes it unlawful: for a person under the age of 16 to operate or be a passenger on a bicycle unless he or she wears a protective bicycle helmet; for a person who weighs less than 40 pounds or is less than 40 inches in height to be a passenger on a bicycle unless the person can be and is properly seated in and adequately secured to a bicycle safety seat; and for a parent or legal guardian of a person below the age of 12 to permit the person to operate or be a passenger on a bicycle in violation of the foregoing provisions. Provides for a civil penalty, and that moneys collected under this Act shall be deposited into the Share the Road Fund. Provides that, in the case of a first offense in a 12 month period, the court shall waive the civil penalty upon receipt of satisfactory proof that the violator has, since the date of the violation, purchased or otherwise obtained an appropriate protective bicycle helmet or bicycle safety seat. Provides that failure to wear a protective bicycle helmet or to secure a passenger to a restraining seat is not admissible as evidence in a trial of any civil action. Provides that except in cases involving a parent or legal guardian of a person below the age of 12, a law enforcement officer observing a violation of the new provisions shall issue a warning to the person and shall not arrest or take into custody any person solely for a violation. Contains definitions and a statement of purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-BICYCLE HELMETS & SEATS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-148.3f | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1517 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1220&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1220.htm |