IL SB1217 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that not less than 75% of the amounts collected by a municipality within DuPage County pursuant to the municipal hotel operators' occupation tax and municipal hotel use tax shall be used to promote tourism within that municipality. Requires that the municipality belong to a not-for-profit organization headquartered in DuPage County that is recognized by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity as a certified local tourism and convention bureau entitled to receive State tourism grant funds. Provides that the remainder of the amounts collected may be used by the municipality for economic development or capital infrastructure. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effectively immediately.
Title
HOTEL OCCUPATION & USE REVENUE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0204 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-017-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-3-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14b | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14c | New Code | See Bill Text |