IL SB1213 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, on and after September 1, 2019, all teacher evaluation ratings on record as "excellent", "proficient", or "needs improvement" are considered "effective" and all teacher evaluation ratings on record as "unsatisfactory" are considered "ineffective" for the purposes of the Employment of Teachers Article. Makes other changes concerning the waiver or modification of mandates; school report cards; license suspension or revocation; contractual continued service; removal or dismissal of teachers; an optional alternative evaluative dismissal process; evaluation plans; a local appeal process for ineffective ratings; rules; the appointment and promotion of teachers in Chicago; alternative procedures for teacher evaluation, remediation, and removal in Chicago; and the Open Meetings Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TEACHERS-EVALUATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-27SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0591
2019-08-27SenateEffective Date August 27, 2019
2019-08-27SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 044-013-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 010-003-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-032-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-003-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-016-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-002-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 016-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Education
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Education
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-17aAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105521B-75Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-11Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-12Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-16.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-9.5New CodeSee Bill Text
105524A-4Amended CodeCitation Text
105524A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105524A-5.5New CodeSee Bill Text
105524A-7Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-84Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-85cAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1213&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1213.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1213eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1213enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0591.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1213sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1213sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1213ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1213_04102019_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1213_05282019_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1213ham001_05312019_069000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback