IL SB1212 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that no school district may pass on the cost of the fee to enroll in a Course Equity Program course to a student if he or she is eligible for (i) Medicaid, (ii) the Children's Health Insurance Program under the Children's Health Insurance Program Act, (iii) the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, or (iv) the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (rather than if the student qualifies to receive free or reduced-price lunch under the federal Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act). Provides that a school district must recognize on an eligible funded student's transcript (rather than student's transcript) each Course Equity Program course completed by the student (rather than each completed course granted approval to be taken by the student). Removes a provision allowing a public community college to serve as a Course Equity Provider; makes a conforming change. Removes a provision requiring a school district to notify students and parents of the availability of Course Equity Program courses. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COURSE EQUITY ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 6-4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |