IL SB1210 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Bill of Rights for the Homeless Act. Sets forth certain rights of homeless persons. Provides that in any civil action alleging a violation of the Act, the court may award appropriate injunctive and declaratory relief, actual damages, and reasonable attorney's fees and costs to a prevailing plaintiff. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act to make corresponding changes. Defines "housing status" as the status of having or not having a fixed or regular residence, including the status of living on the streets, in a shelter, or in a temporary residence.
Title
HOMELESS BILL OF RIGHTS-NEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0516 |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Effective Date August 22, 2013 |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-007-000 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-033-000 |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-011-001 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-004-001 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |