IL SB1200 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, in order to further the prevention of accidents, the Department of Transportation shall conduct a traffic study following the occurrence of any accident involving a fatality that occurs on a State highway. Provides that the study shall include, but not be limited to, consideration of alternative geometric design improvements, traffic control devices, and any other improvements that the Department deems necessary. Provides that the Department shall make the results of the study available to the public on its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAFFIC FATALITY STUDY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-210Amended CodeCitation Text
20270549.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback