IL SB1189 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that an approved waiver from or modification to a physical education mandate may remain in effect for a period not to exceed 2 school years (rather than 5 school years like other mandate waivers) and may be renewed no more than 2 times upon application by an eligible applicant. Provides that an approved waiver from or modification to a physical education mandate may be changed within the 2-year period by the school board or regional superintendent of schools, whichever is applicable, following the procedure set forth in the Code for the initial waiver or modification request. Provides that a school board may determine the schedule or frequency of physical education courses, provided that an elementary school pupil engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 150 minutes per week and a middle school, junior high school, or high school pupil engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 225 minutes per week (rather than engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 3 days per 5-day week). Provides that if a student non-attendance day is scheduled for a day that would otherwise include a physical education class or if the school building is not otherwise open to students on a day that would otherwise include a physical education class, a student is not required to make up the minutes from that class; defines "student non-attendance day". Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PHYSICAL EDUCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Education; 009-007-000
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback