IL SB1163 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides that any person who performs a notarial act concerning election nominating papers, petitions of objections to nominating papers, or certificates of withdrawal of candidacy, and is not otherwise authorized to perform notarial acts, shall, in addition to any penalties which may be imposed under the Act, also be in violation of the Election Code. Amends the Election Code. Provides that any person who performs unauthorized notarial acts concerning election nominating papers, petitions of objections to nominating papers, or certificates of withdrawal of candidacy in violation of the Illinois Notary Public Act, is also in violation of the Code, and shall be subject to a specified penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NOTARY PUB-NOMINATING PAPERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10529-12.5New CodeSee Bill Text
53127-110New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback