IL SB1159 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for dates of service from January 1, 2020 through December 31, 2020, rates or payments for home health visits shall be $91; for dates of service from January 1, 2021 through December 31, 2021, rates or payments for home health visits shall be $111; and for dates of service on and after January 1, 2022, rates or payments for home health visits shall be $131. Provides that for dates of service from January 1, 2020 through December 31, 2020, rates or payments for the certified nursing assistant component of the home health agency rate shall be $25; for dates of service from January 1, 2021 through December 31, 2021, rates or payments for the certified nursing assistant component of the home health agency rate shall be $30; and for dates of service on and after January 1, 2022, rates or payments for the certified nursing assistant component of the home health agency rate shall be $35. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-HOME HEALTH-RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1159&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1159.htm |