IL SB1158 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Repeals provision that committed persons shall be responsible to reimburse the Department of Corrections for the expenses incurred by their incarceration at a rate to be determined by the Department. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL INCARCERATION COST-RIMB

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 006-003-001
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-12-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-12-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-2-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-7-6Repealed CodeCitation Text
73554-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback