IL SB1158 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Alternate Fuels Act. Authorizes the Secretary of State to collect annual user fees from any individual, partnership, association, corporation, or agency of the United States government that registers any combination of 10 or more of the specified types of motor vehicles in the State of Illinois (now, those fees are collected only if one of those entities registers 10 or more of the specified types of vehicles in specific portions of the Chicago metropolitan area). Increases the amount of the fee from $20 to $40. Effective immediately.
Title
ALT FUELS-USER FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 120 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1158&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1158.htm |